AR SB11 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB11 is now Act 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB11 is now Act 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Arkansas Corporations And Arkansas Banks To Hold Annual Or Special Shareholder Meetings Remotely; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow Arkansas Corporations And Arkansas Banks To Hold Annual Or Special Shareholder Meetings Remotely; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Notification that SB11 is now Act 253 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-25 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Filed |