AR SB1007 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1007 is now Act 1284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1007 is now Act 1284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning United States History Courses In Public Schools.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning United States History Courses In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB1007 is now Act 1284 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-30 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |