AR HR1054 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Congratulate The Greenwood High School Bulldog Athletes And Coaches For Their Exceptional Accomplishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Congratulate The Greenwood High School Bulldog Athletes And Coaches For Their Exceptional Accomplishments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2019-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback