AR HR1013 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify Gun Rights.
Title
To Clarify Gun Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1013 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HR1013.pdf |