AR HR1006 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize International Omphalocele Awareness Day On January 31, 2015; And To Commend The Mothers Of Omphaloceles For Their Advocacy Efforts.
Title
To Recognize International Omphalocele Awareness Day On January 31, 2015; And To Commend The Mothers Of Omphaloceles For Their Advocacy Efforts.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meeks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1006 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1006.pdf |