AR HR1003 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Designate May 5-11, 2024 As "tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Title
To Designate May 5-11, 2024 As "tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2024-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hr1003&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2024F |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2024F%2FPublic%2FHR1003.pdf |