AR HCR1011 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Providing That The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly May Recess On Tuesday, March 23, 2021, And Reconvene On Monday, March 29, 2021.
Title
Providing That The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly May Recess On Tuesday, March 23, 2021, And Reconvene On Monday, March 29, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-04 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hcr1011&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HCR1011/HCR1011030320211630.pdf |