AR HCR1006 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Providing For Recesses Of Four (4) Or More Consecutive Days Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Title
Providing For Recesses Of Four (4) Or More Consecutive Days Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate Of The Ninety-third General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-01-13 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-01-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-01-13 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-12 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |