AR HCR1005 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 19 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Proclaim Religious Freedom Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Proclaim Religious Freedom Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-01-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-01-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-01-19HouseReturned From Senate concurred in.
2021-01-19SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2021-01-19SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2021-01-14SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2021-01-14SenateReceived from the House.
2021-01-14HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-01-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-01-12HouseTransfer To The Committee On House Management
2021-01-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-01-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback