AR HCR1003 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly; And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Title
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Eighty-ninth General Assembly; And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Davy Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-02-27 | House | Returned from Senate concurred as amended #1. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as concurred in as Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-12 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed |