AR HB2024 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Publication Requirements Of County Ordinances.
Title
Concerning The Publication Requirements Of County Ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 18 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-15 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |