AR HB2020 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Requiring Candidates For President And Vice President Of The United States To Provide Evidence Of Their Qualifications For The Office.
Title
An Act Requiring Candidates For President And Vice President Of The United States To Provide Evidence Of Their Qualifications For The Office.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Hubbard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | House Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-17 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-16 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2020 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HB2020.pdf |