AR HB1994 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Driving While Intoxicated Court Program.
Title
To Create A Driving While Intoxicated Court Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - The vote by which HB1994 Passed was expunged. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | House Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-04-01 | House WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR | |
2011-04-01 | House The vote by which HB1994 Passed was expunged. | |
2011-04-01 | House EXPUNGED | |
2011-04-01 | House Motion to recall from the Senate passed. | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned From the Senate as requested. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned To the House as requested. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-30 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-18 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-18 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-18 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-11 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-11 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-11 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |