AR HB1922 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedures For Annexation Into An Adjoining Municipality.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Procedures For Annexation Into An Adjoining Municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-26 | House | Filed |