AR HB1914 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Disclosure Of Information Relating To A Dependency-neglect Proceeding Or A Family In Need Of Services Proceeding.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Disclosure Of Information Relating To A Dependency-neglect Proceeding Or A Family In Need Of Services Proceeding.
Sponsors
Rep. Mickey Gates [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Grant Hodges [R] |
Sen. John Cooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2017-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1914 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1914.pdf |