AR HB1911 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1911 is now Act 1027
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Income Tax Act Of 1929 Concerning Who Shall Be Treated As The Owner Of A Portion Of A Trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Income Tax Act Of 1929 Concerning Who Shall Be Treated As The Owner Of A Portion Of A Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1911 is now Act 1027
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-04-08HouseRe-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-04-08HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-08SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-04-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-04-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback