AR HB1900 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Public-private Partnerships For Transportation Facilities And Projects; And To Create The Public-private Transportation Act.
Title
To Provide For Public-private Partnerships For Transportation Facilities And Projects; And To Create The Public-private Transportation Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-20 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2015-03-17 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1900 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HB1900.pdf |