AR HB1842 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify Terms Under The Arkansas Fiscal Assessment And Accountability Program.
Title
To Clarify Terms Under The Arkansas Fiscal Assessment And Accountability Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |