AR HB1819 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that HB1819 is now Act 547
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that HB1819 is now Act 547
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Remove From The Governor's Disaster Emergency Responsibilities The Power To Suspend Or Limit The Sale, Dispensing, Or Transportation Of Firearms.
Title
To Remove From The Governor's Disaster Emergency Responsibilities The Power To Suspend Or Limit The Sale, Dispensing, Or Transportation Of Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Notification that HB1819 is now Act 547 |
2013-03-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |