AR HB1813 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Notification that HB1813 is now Act 584
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Notification that HB1813 is now Act 584
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Adult And Long-term Care Facility Resident Maltreatment Act; And To Add Definitions And To Describe The Procedures Of The Department Of Human Services.
Title
To Clarify The Adult And Long-term Care Facility Resident Maltreatment Act; And To Add Definitions And To Describe The Procedures Of The Department Of Human Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Notification that HB1813 is now Act 584 |
2013-03-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-28 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |