AR HB1761 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Egg Provider Protection Act.
Title
To Create The Egg Provider Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-13 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |