AR HB1759 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Increase The Penalties For Aggravated Assault And Misdemeanor Assault If Committed Against Certain Persons.
Title
To Increase The Penalties For Aggravated Assault And Misdemeanor Assault If Committed Against Certain Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-18 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-01 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-01 | House Filed |