AR HB1662 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1662 is now Act 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding The Salaries Of Personnel And Other Requirements Of Various District Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding The Salaries Of Personnel And Other Requirements Of Various District Courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 4 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in. (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1662 is now Act 786
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 4 read and concurred in.
2019-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 3 read and concurred in.
2019-04-03HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 3 & 4
2019-04-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-01HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 3 & 4
2019-04-01SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28SenateAmendment # 3 and #4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 and #4
2019-03-25SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback