AR HB1660 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Notification that HB1660 is now Act 761
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law To Require Monthly Municipal Financial Reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law To Require Monthly Municipal Financial Reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseNotification that HB1660 is now Act 761
2017-03-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
2017-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-23HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-22HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback