AR HB1657 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-12)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1657 is now Act 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-12)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Notification that HB1657 is now Act 405
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Designate The Official Steam Locomotive Of The State Of Arkansas.
Title
To Designate The Official Steam Locomotive Of The State Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Notification that HB1657 is now Act 405 |
2021-03-18 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-17 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |