AR HB1620 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1620 is now Act 477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1620 is now Act 477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning A Criminal Background Check In Cases Of Child Custody And Visitation.
Title
Concerning A Criminal Background Check In Cases Of Child Custody And Visitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Gossage [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1620 is now Act 477 |
2013-03-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-18 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-03-14 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |