AR HB1572 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1572 is now Act 476
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1572 is now Act 476
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate Prepaid Funeral Benefits Contracts And Investments Under The Arkansas Prepaid Funeral Benefits Law.
Title
To Regulate Prepaid Funeral Benefits Contracts And Investments Under The Arkansas Prepaid Funeral Benefits Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Kerr [R] | Sen. Johnny Key [R] | Rep. Jonathan Barnett [R] | Rep. Robert Altes [R] |
Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Rep. Andrea Lea [R] | Sen. Terry Rice [R] | Rep. Stephen Meeks [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1572 is now Act 476 |
2013-03-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2013-03-01 | House | Filed |