AR HB1555 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - House Notification that HB1555 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - House Notification that HB1555 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Sale Of Air Conditioning Parts To Scrap Metal Recyclers.
Title
Concerning The Sale Of Air Conditioning Parts To Scrap Metal Recyclers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House Notification that HB1555 is now Act 348 | |
2011-03-16 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-15 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-15 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-08 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-04 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-04 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-03 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-24 | House Filed |