AR HB1529 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Notification that HB1529 is now Act 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring Training Of Law Enforcement Officers In The Identification Of A Controlled Substance Overdose And The Role Of Naloxone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring Training Of Law Enforcement Officers In The Identification Of A Controlled Substance Overdose And The Role Of Naloxone.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseNotification that HB1529 is now Act 646
2019-03-29HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-20HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback