AR HB1505 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1505 is now Act 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that HB1505 is now Act 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Reports Under The Transformation And Efficiencies Act Of 2019 Including Savings Reports.
Title
To Require Reports Under The Transformation And Efficiencies Act Of 2019 Including Savings Reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Notification that HB1505 is now Act 565 |
2019-03-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-07 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |