AR HB1457 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1457 is now Act 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Notification that HB1457 is now Act 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Arkansas Poll Watchers Bill Of Rights Act Of 2023; To Amend The Law Concerning Poll Watchers; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Procedures.
Title
To Establish The Arkansas Poll Watchers Bill Of Rights Act Of 2023; To Amend The Law Concerning Poll Watchers; And To Amend The Law Concerning Election Procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1457 is now Act 444 |
2023-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2023-02-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-02-20 | House | Filed |