AR HB1439 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1439 is now Act 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1439 is now Act 968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Update The Volunteer Health Care Act; And To Include Therapists, Addiction Specialists, And Counselors In The Volunteer Healthcare Program.
Title
To Update The Volunteer Health Care Act; And To Include Therapists, Addiction Specialists, And Counselors In The Volunteer Healthcare Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Notification that HB1439 is now Act 968 |
2021-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-22 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2 |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1 and Amendment #2. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 AND 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |