AR HB1430 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Certain Laws Relating To The Participation Of Homeschooled Students In Interscholastic Activities.
Title
To Amend Certain Laws Relating To The Participation Of Homeschooled Students In Interscholastic Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-03-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to re-refer back to committee passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |