AR HB1404 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1404 is now Act 191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Notification that HB1404 is now Act 191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Or Repeal Provisions Of The Arkansas Justice Building Act.
Title
To Amend Or Repeal Provisions Of The Arkansas Justice Building Act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House Notification that HB1404 is now Act 191 | |
2011-03-02 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-02 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-17 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-14 | House Filed |