AR HB1372 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that HB1372 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that HB1372 is now Act 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Notice Of Child Maltreatment Reports To Military Organizations.
Title
To Provide Notice Of Child Maltreatment Reports To Military Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1372 is now Act 528 |
2017-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |