AR HB1371 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Child Academic Opportunity Scholarship And Grant Act.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Child Academic Opportunity Scholarship And Grant Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-17 | House | Clincher Motion Fails of Adoption |
2021-03-17 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-10 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |