AR HB1366 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Notification that HB1366 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Notification that HB1366 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding The Priority Of Distributions From The State Administration Of Justice Fund; To Make Technical Corrections To Clarify The Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding The Priority Of Distributions From The State Administration Of Justice Fund; To Make Technical Corrections To Clarify The Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Sen. David Burnett [D] | Rep. Mary Broadaway [D] | Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] |
Rep. Nate Steel [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Notification that HB1366 is now Act 504 |
2013-03-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |