AR HB1361 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-7)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Notification that HB1361 is now Act 248
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-7)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Notification that HB1361 is now Act 248
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Tax Treatment Of Certain Loans, Payments, And Expenses Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Relief Programs; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Provide For The Tax Treatment Of Certain Loans, Payments, And Expenses Related To Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Relief Programs; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1361 is now Act 248 |
2021-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-22 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment No. 2 & 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 & 3 |
2021-02-08 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-08 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |