AR HB1355 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1355 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Notification that HB1355 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Remove Licensing Requirements For A Motor Vehicle Salesperson And A Recreational Vehicle Salesperson; And To Create The Automotive Technologist Education Grant Program And Fund.
Title
To Remove Licensing Requirements For A Motor Vehicle Salesperson And A Recreational Vehicle Salesperson; And To Create The Automotive Technologist Education Grant Program And Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Notification that HB1355 is now Act 504 |
2021-03-30 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |