AR HB1354 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1354 is now Act 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1354 is now Act 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Distribute Revenues From The Additional Registration Fee For Electric Vehicles, Hybrid Vehicles, And Plug-in Hybrid Vehicles Under The Arkansas Highway Revenue Distribution Law.
Title
To Distribute Revenues From The Additional Registration Fee For Electric Vehicles, Hybrid Vehicles, And Plug-in Hybrid Vehicles Under The Arkansas Highway Revenue Distribution Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1354 is now Act 211 |
2023-03-01 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-28 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed |