AR HB1349 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-9)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Every Arkansan Retirement Plan Opportunity Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Every Arkansan Retirement Plan Opportunity Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - HB 1349 failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateDied on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2021-04-22SenateThe vote by which HB1349 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2021-04-22SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Roll call requested. Motion passed.
2021-04-22SenateUpon Sounding of the Ballot, HB1349 failed to pass.
2021-04-22SenateSounding of the Ballot requested on the passage HB1349.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-20SenateThe vote by which HB1349 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2021-04-20SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Motion passed.
2021-04-20SenateUpon Sounding of the Ballot, HB1349 failed to pass.
2021-04-20SenateSounding of the Ballot requsted on the passage of HB1349.
2021-04-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-11SenateMotion for CLINCHER Failed.
2021-03-11SenateThe vote by which HB 1349 failed to pass was expunged.
2021-03-11SenateRead the third time and failed.
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote by which HB1349 failed to pass. Motion passed.
2021-03-11SenateMotion to Lay on the Table failed.
2021-03-11SenateRead the third time.
2021-03-10SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2021-03-10SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-09HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-09HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-09HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-08HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-02-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1349&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1349/HB1349012920211418.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1349/HB1349030920211226.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1349-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1349&rcs=2284&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1349&rcs=2274&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1349&rcs=2924&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1349&rcs=3055&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1349&rcs=3054&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback