AR HB1346 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1346 is now Act 826
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Notification that HB1346 is now Act 826
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Purchase Of Military Service Credit Under The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System By A Member Of The General Assembly.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Purchase Of Military Service Credit Under The Arkansas Public Employees' Retirement System By A Member Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Notification that HB1346 is now Act 826 |
2019-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-01 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |