AR HB1342 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1-1)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting Nonimmigrants Legally Admitted To The United States Under A Compact Of Free Association To Be A Certified Law Enforcement Officer; And To Be Known As The "marshallese Law Enforcement Act".
Title
Permitting Nonimmigrants Legally Admitted To The United States Under A Compact Of Free Association To Be A Certified Law Enforcement Officer; And To Be Known As The "marshallese Law Enforcement Act".
Sponsors
Rep. Megan Godfrey [D] | Sen. David Wallace [R] | Sen. Clint Penzo [R] | Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Rep. Logan Jett [R] | Rep. Les Eaves [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawks [R] | Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R] |
Rep. Craig Christiansen [R] | Rep. Mark Berry [R] | Rep. Danny Watson [R] | Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-02 | House | Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |