AR HB1324 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Give Pregnant Women Priority Access To Substance Abuse Treatment And Recovery Services; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Give Pregnant Women Priority Access To Substance Abuse Treatment And Recovery Services; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-02-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |