AR HB1308 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Notification that HB1308 is now Act 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Notification that HB1308 is now Act 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Re-hiring Of Disability Retirants Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Re-hiring Of Disability Retirants Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Notification that HB1308 is now Act 209 |
2019-02-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-13 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |