AR HB1259 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1259 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1259 is now Act 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act; And To Authorize Athletic Trainers To Practice Under The Direct Supervision Of A Physician.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Athletic Trainers Act; And To Authorize Athletic Trainers To Practice Under The Direct Supervision Of A Physician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Notification that HB1259 is now Act 348 |
2021-03-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-09 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended #1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |