AR HB1241 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Notification that HB1241 is now Act 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Notification that HB1241 is now Act 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Probationer And Parolee Restricted Driver's License Permits.
Title
Concerning Probationer And Parolee Restricted Driver's License Permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Tosh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Notification that HB1241 is now Act 69 |
2019-02-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-02-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-01-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |