AR HB1224 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Notification that HB1224 is now Act 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Notification that HB1224 is now Act 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Redemption Deed Or Sale Deed To Be Canceled And A Penalty Imposed If The Payment Instrument Used To Redeem Or Purchase Tax-delinquent Property Fails Or Is Dishonored.
Title
To Allow A Redemption Deed Or Sale Deed To Be Canceled And A Penalty Imposed If The Payment Instrument Used To Redeem Or Purchase Tax-delinquent Property Fails Or Is Dishonored.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1224 is now Act 173 |
2023-02-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-02-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-02-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed |