AR HB1194 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Notification that HB1194 is now Act 262
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Notification that HB1194 is now Act 262
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow The Commissioner Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Round The Percentage Change Between The Purchase Price Of A Commodity And The Consumer Price Index For All Urban Consumers To The Nearest One Hundred Dollars.
Title
To Allow The Commissioner Of Elementary And Secondary Education To Round The Percentage Change Between The Purchase Price Of A Commodity And The Consumer Price Index For All Urban Consumers To The Nearest One Hundred Dollars.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Warren [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Notification that HB1194 is now Act 262 |
2021-03-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed |