AR HB1174 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Notification that HB1174 is now Act 63
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Notification that HB1174 is now Act 63
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Eliminate The Nursing Home Consultant Pharmacist Permit And The Disease State Management Credential.
Title
To Eliminate The Nursing Home Consultant Pharmacist Permit And The Disease State Management Credential.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Notification that HB1174 is now Act 63 |
2021-02-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-01-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed |